Gulamhusein, Aliya Fatemah (CPSO#: 90551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 9-EN 224
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3631
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aliya Gulamhusein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gulamhusein ( CPSO# 90551 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 9-EN 224
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4868

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIYA FATEMAH GULAMHUSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULAMHUSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013