Gulati, Brij Bhushan (CPSO#: 90300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Nagpur University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 328-7321
Fax: (705) 328-7318
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brij Bhushan Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gulati ( CPSO# 90300 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-7321

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Brij  Bhushan  Gulati  may  practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
            only.