Gulati, Sanjiv Kumar (CPSO#: 92682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Himachal Pradesh University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FORENSIC TREATMENT UNIT (FTU)
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 345-1461 Ext. 2688
Fax: 613-345-7276
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjiv Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gulati ( CPSO# 92682 )

Business Address:
St Lawrence Valley Correctional
and Treatment Centre
Secure Treatment Unit
P O Box 1050 1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone Number: (613) 341-2870

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sanjiv  Kumar Gulati may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Forensic Psychiatry.