Gulavita, Previn Yohan (CPSO#: 93446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4407
Fax: (613) 748-4921
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Previn Gulavita Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gulavita ( CPSO# 93446 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREVIN YOHAN GULAVITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULAVITA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2016