Gunaratnam, Selvaratnam (CPSO#: 71933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical record requests may be faxed to Dr. Gunaratnam at 905 702 9046.
Date Received: 08 Oct 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 9, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Selvaratnam
            Gunaratnam, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Gunaratnam to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Gunaratnam has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.