Gunaratnam, Senthuran (CPSO#: 96051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  15 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 4162848131 Ext. 5330
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Senthuran Gunaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gunaratnam ( CPSO# 96051 )

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 666-0831

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Senthuran  Gunaratnam may practise psychiatry at the Scarborough and
                  Rouge Hospital -  Centenary  Site,  in  Scarborough, Ontario, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  three  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Gunaratnam's eligibility to take  the
                  Royal College of  Physicians  and Surgeons of Canada examination expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Gunaratnam's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or attitude,  does  not
                        provide the required reports to the College by  the  due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Gunaratnam's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on August 16, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before August 15, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.