Gundy, Serena Laura (CPSO#: 91137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC-3V39
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 76992
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Gundy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gundy ( CPSO# 91137 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Suite HSC-3V39
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERENA LAURA GUNDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2016