Gunton, Lara Kathryn (CPSO#: 90619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: Andrachuk, Lara Kathryn (used until: 05 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Prince Charles Dr. North
Suite 102
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: 905 732 4224
Fax: 905 227 9889
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gunton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gunton ( CPSO# 90619 )
Dr. M. Gunton ( CPSO# 89391 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 4J6
Phone Number: (905) 732-4404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA KATHRYN GUNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014