Guo, Merry (CPSO#: 108937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
309 - 1580 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON  K2G 4B5
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERRY GUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018