Gupta, Alok (CPSO#: 88719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jammu University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2315 Bristol Circle
SUITE 102
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: 905-829-2827
Fax: 905-829-2831
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Main Street West 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: 905-546-9885
Fax: 905-528-3899
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

880 Upper Wentworth Street # 2 B
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Canada
Phone: 905538 7650
Fax: 9055384625
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1475 Upper Ottawa St.
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: (905)528-3899
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alok Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 88719 )

Business Address:
#2B
880 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 538-7650

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1539

Business Address:
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 102
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2827

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALOK GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 27 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2013