Gupta, Amitabh (CPSO#: 89683)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010