Gupta, Amitabha (CPSO#: 101831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Hahnemann Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

350 Rutherford Rd S
Suite 300
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

9135 Keele St
Suite A5
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Canada
Phone: (416)663-3937
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

145 Kingston Road East
Unit 3
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 101831)

Business Address:
300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P3
Phone Number: (416) 292-5426

Business Address:
Suite A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
3-145 Kingston Road East
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4
Phone Number: (905) 239-0118

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2

Business Address:
300 - 350 Rutherford Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Jan 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Amitabha Gupta may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)