Gupta, Aparna (CPSO#: 86666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
lakeridge Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (905) 428-5335
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Internal Medicine Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-3118
Fax: (416) 281-7384
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

320 Harwood Avenue South
Unit : 2
Ajax
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Canada
Phone: 9052311122
Fax: 9052311124
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aparna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 86666 )

Business Address:
Rough Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Rouge Valley-Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-3118

Business Address:
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Business Address:
Unit 2
320 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APARNA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012