Gupta, Archna (CPSO#: 91598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Names: Narula, Archna (used until: 28 Jul 2016 )     Gupta, Archna (used until: 04 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wise Elephant Family Health Team
2 Kennedy Road South, Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone: (289) 323-0660
Fax: (905) 459-6373
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Archna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 91598 )

Business Address:
4 - 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARCHNA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011