Gupta, Arun Tinku (CPSO#: 90094)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2005 to 28 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2008 to 11 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2009