Gupta, Ashish (CPSO#: 91586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
L2121, CPCR Bldg
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8830
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashish Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 91586 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
CPCR Building Room L2121
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8957

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ashish  Gupta  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology
            and interventional radiology.