Gupta, Jacqueline Pariat (CPSO#: 94528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ansley Grove Medical Centre
Unit 9
110 Ansley Grove Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 3R1
Phone: 905-605-8444
Fax: 905-605-2520
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gupta ( CPSO# 94528 )

Business Address:
Newmarket Medical Centre
Unit 6
17725 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7C1
Phone Number: (905) 853-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE PARIAT GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012