Gupta, Kumar Kashyap (CPSO#: 68318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
228 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M5A 1S3
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Turning Point Clinic
79 Dunlop St W
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Canada
Phone: (705) 503-4900
Fax: (705) 503-4902
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

228 Queen street east
Toronto ON  M5A1S3
Canada
Phone: (647) 351-3601
Fax: (647) 351-3801
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kumar Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gupta ( CPSO# 68318 )

Business Address:
Market Street Health Clinic
149 Augusta Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2L4
Phone Number: (647) 341-6292

Business Address:
Turning Point Clinic
79 Dunlop Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1A5
Phone Number: (705) 503-4900

Business Address:
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 368-6304

Business Address:
247 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4L 3B4
Phone Number: (416) 466-6800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUMAR KASHYAP GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1996