Gupta, Rajeev (CPSO#: 76886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 799-1399
Fax: (905) 799-9099
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Pediatrics
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 76886 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 799-1399

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJEEV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 31 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2004