Gupta, Rohit (CPSO#: 78613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Department of Surgery
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 646-0392
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rohit Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 78613 )

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial hsopital
Department of Surgery
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 646-0392

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROHIT GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2007 to 20 Oct 2007
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013