Gupta, Salil Kumar (CPSO#: 88667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302A
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 586-3145
Fax: (705) 586-4144
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salil Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 88667 )

Business Address:
302A - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 586-3145

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALIL KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013