Gupta, Samir (CPSO#: 79499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 6044 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2252
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 79499 )
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 90787 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Room 6044 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5P 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 932-3172

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004