Gupta, Sanjay Kumar (CPSO#: 70412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1370 Dundas St. East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone: 416-231-3369
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjay K. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 70412 )

Business Address:
402 - 3025 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1
Phone Number: (905) 896-2900

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2007 to 26 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2008 to 26 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2009 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996