Gupta, Sanjay (CPSO#: 80043)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2003 to 21 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004