Gupta, Vasudha (CPSO#: 92807)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON, K7L 5G2
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016