Gupta-Bhatnagar, Shikha (CPSO#: 92806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: Gupta, Shikha (used until: 11 Feb 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Pediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIKHA GUPTA-BHATNAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA-BHATNAGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015