Guron, Namrata Kaur (CPSO#: 93449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4871
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAMRATA KAUR GURON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2017