Guscott, Jesse Richard (CPSO#: 79293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Guscott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Guscott ( CPSO# 79293 )

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE RICHARD GUSCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUSCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005