Guscott, Richard Gregory (CPSO#: 52413)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 400 - 723 Rymal Rd W Hamilton, ON L9B 2W2
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2018