Gutcher, Spencer Thomas (CPSO#: 95823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gutcher Last Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gutcher ( CPSO# 95823 )
Dr. C. Last ( CPSO# 97938 )

Business Address:
Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
39 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2J9
Phone Number: (613) 264-2686

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SPENCER THOMAS GUTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014