Gvozdic, Dusanka (CPSO#: 95138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Bronte St South
Suite 209
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: 905-636-1888
Fax: 905-636-1124
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSANKA GVOZDIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GVOZDIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014