Gwiazda, Katarzyna Magdalena (CPSO#: 80301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital Site
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7557
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gwiazda Nasirzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 89594 )
Dr. K. Gwiazda ( CPSO# 80301 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Family
Practice Associates
Suite 205
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-8144

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 804-7741

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATARZYNA MAGDALENA GWIAZDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWIAZDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2003 to 05 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

McMaster University, 06 Dec 2003 to 09 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009