Gyomorey, Sandor (CPSO#: 79418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 744-3199
Fax: (416) 744-0943
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W2Z8
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandor Gyomorey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gyomorey ( CPSO# 79418 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 206
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 744-3199

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDOR GYOMOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GYOMOREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2009