Gysler, Mathias (CPSO#: 26669)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 25 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jan 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 25-Jan-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathias Gysler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1974
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 25 Jan 2018