First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Dec 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Nov 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2008 |