Gupta, Hemi (CPSO#: 78301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-5613
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Hemi Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5664

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Sep 2003 CFPC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEMI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2002 to 22 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003