Ha, Irene Ngai-Kwan (CPSO#: 95917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3L2
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-9097
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irene N.K. Ha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ha ( CPSO# 95917 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3L2
Phone Number: (905) 832-3838

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE NGAI-KWAN HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014