Haas, Barbara (CPSO#: 84466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Room H186
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5255
Fax: 416-480-5499
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Haas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Haas ( CPSO# 84466 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H186 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA HAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015