Haas, Gwen (CPSO#: 54485)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Haas-Hawkings, Gwen Harriet (used until: 22 Apr 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2003