Habal, Marlena Vanessa (CPSO#: 93778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Center for Advanced Cardiac Care
622 West 168th Street
PH12-134
New York NY  10032
United States
Phone: (646) 317-4272
Fax: (212) 305-5306

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLENA VANESSA HABAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015