Habdank-Kossowski, Katherine Maria Walewski (CPSO#: 79187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Walewski, Katherine Maria (used until: 30 Jun 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Fax: 905-788-0046
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Habdank-Kossowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Habdank-Kossowski ( CPSO# 79195 )
Dr. K. Habdank-Kossowski ( CPSO# 79187 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
Port Colborne Hospital
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
Welland General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARIA WALEWSKI HABDANK-KOSSOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABDANK-KOSSOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On July 8, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Habdank-Kossowski in respect of an incident that took place in December 2003, during an emergency medicine rotation in her first year of residency.