Habhab, Wael Taher (CPSO#: 78554)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 18 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2003 to 18 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2006 to 18 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2007 to 18 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2008 to 18 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008