Habib, Wasif Muhammad (CPSO#: 91961)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 27 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Sci & Technology, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2018