Habibi, Mehri (CPSO#: 82222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1502
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3600 Ext. 33554
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

WOHC Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33555
Fax: (416) 747-3408
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehri Habibi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Habibi ( CPSO# 82222 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (647) 291-1084

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRI HABIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 23 May 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2010