Habing, David Kenneth (CPSO#: 67761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Habing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Habing ( CPSO# 67761 )

Business Address:
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 563-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH HABING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1999