Hack, Arshad (CPSO#: 87073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Connecticut, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 632-2542
Fax: (905) 632-2617
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arshad Hack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hack ( CPSO# 87073 )

Business Address:
5200 Corporate Drive
Burlington ON  L7L 7G7
Phone Number: (905) 825-6000

Business Address:
Unit 208
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 632-2542

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARSHAD HACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009