Hackmon, Rinat (CPSO#: 94140)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013