Haddad, Alain (CPSO#: 82508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-7700 Ext. 25395
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alain Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haddad ( CPSO# 82508 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 17 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2009 to 17 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013