Haddad, Haissam (CPSO#: 76908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tichreen, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Department of Medicine
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 844-1132
Fax: (306) 844-1525
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haissam Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Haddad ( CPSO# 76908 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAISSAM HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001