Haddad, Riad (CPSO#: 78528)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004